Thompson v. F/V Champ et al

Plaintiff: Larry T. Thompson
Defendant: F/V Champ, Corey Potter and Maybe Martinez
Case Number: 3:2010cv00202
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: H. Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff to file Status Report on or before 1/31/2011. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
March 31, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER granting Motion 25 to Fix Time for Intervention. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 4, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re MOTION 40 for Default Judgment In Rem. MJ recommends motion be granted. RR filed as a final and to be forwarded to assigned DJ for his determination. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 5, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Default Judgment In Rem. Judgment is entered as follows: Plaintiff shall recover from defendant the sum of $231,933.15, inclusive of costs pre-judgment interest through 10/5/11, plus pre-judgment interest of $49.29 per day after 10/5/11. Total judgment shall bear interest at the rate of 10% per annum. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/5/11. (CLW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/5/2011 to update dkt txt (CLW, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Granting MOTION 46 for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Sale; AND Granting MOTION 44 for Order of Sale. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts cc:USM/CMC/Finance(JAM, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. F/V Champ et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry T. Thompson
Represented By: Joan M. Travostino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Champ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Potter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybe Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]