McGlothlin et al v. Drake et al

Plaintiff: Danny McGlothlin and MCB Sales & Installation Services Inc
Defendant: Frank Drake, Cequent Performance Products Inc and Cequent Trailer Products Inc
Case Number: 1:2011cv00055
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Cequent Performance Products Inc's 93 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/2013. (mcz)
May 16, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting Frank Drake's 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and pltfs' 33 Motion to Non-Suit Drake Individually; all claims against Drake are dismissed without prejudice; pltfs' 40 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED; pltfs must file their amended complaint within seven days after entry of this Opinion and Order; Cequent's 26 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Frank Drake terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/12. (vjt)
August 14, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 48 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlothlin et al v. Drake et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny McGlothlin
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCB Sales & Installation Services Inc
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Drake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cequent Performance Products Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cequent Trailer Products Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]