Stringfellow et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Plaintiff: Donnie W Stringfellow, II and Sandra A Stringfellow
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00084
Filed: August 28, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Cleburne
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER denying, without prejudice, 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 26 Motion to Stay and suspending the scheduling order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/13. (kpr)
July 10, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER LIFTING STAY. The Court directs the parties, before they renew any motion, to confer and consider whether the Johnson issues can be handled by agreement. Joint report due by 31 July 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/13. (kpr)
October 24, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Stay Discovery, and for Issuance of a Revised Scheduling Order filed by Donnie W Stringf ellow, II, Sandra A Stringfellow. The 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Federal National Mortgage Association is converted to a motion for summary judgment. The Court directs defendan ts to file a statement of disputed material facts by November 6, 2013. Plaintiffs' responding papers are due by November 27, 2013. Any reply is due by December 6, 2013. These ddls will not be extended. Depositions should be scheduled to comply with the briefing schedule. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/24/13. (kpr)
January 9, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2014. (jak)
January 9, 2014 57 Featured Case JUDGMENT dismissing all the Stringfellows' claims with prejudice with two exceptions. Their application-of-payments and foreclosure-related fees claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stringfellow et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie W Stringfellow, II
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra A Stringfellow
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Represented By: Rachel Bess Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Represented By: Rachel Bess Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]