Mero v. Independence County Jail

Plaintiff: Rusty Roy Mero
Defendant: Independence County Jail, Ronald Jefferys, Branscom, Garcia, Patrick Stone and Webb
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00040
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against Independence County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice and his claims against Ronald Jefferys are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/13. (vjt)
March 21, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Mero's relatiation claim and his claim for compensatory damages are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/21/2014. (ks)
August 29, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER appointing Attorney Amy Lee Stewart for Rusty Roy Mero. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Ms. Stewart a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Under Local Rule 83.7, counsel must make written application to withdraw within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mero v. Independence County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Roy Mero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Jefferys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branscom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]