McClung et al v. Masset et al

Defendant: Glen A Masset and United States Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Kim McClung and John McClung
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00044
Filed: May 10, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Cleburne
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO as moot. The preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for August 21, 2013 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/19/13. (kpr)
October 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Eric E. Wolfgang to appear as co-counsel for petitioners. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/13. (kpr)
October 24, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Strike and denying Petitioners' request for a jury trial. The Court's 25 Initial Scheduling Order is vacated. The Court denies without prejudice petitioners' request for discovery. Respondents' motion for extension is denied as moot 29 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/24/13. (kpr)
September 26, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER overruling the McClungs' 32 objection to the administrative record and denying their request to supplement the record; granting Respondents' 37 motion to strike and denying the McClungs' 1 petition for review. The relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/25/2014. (rhm)
September 26, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 44 Opinion and Order that was entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/26/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McClung et al v. Masset et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen A Masset
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim McClung
Represented By: David Wayne Sterling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McClung
Represented By: David Wayne Sterling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]