Fitzhugh v. Fitzhugh

Plaintiff: Edward Fitzhugh
Defendant: Thomas B Fitzhugh, Jr
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00108
Filed: August 2, 2010
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 10 Featured Case LETTER ORDER re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Fitzhugh directing a response to be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 5, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/2/11. (kpr)
August 26, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 7 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 14 Motion to Continue and continuing the trial setting and all pending ddls indefinitely. A status hearing will set for after February 1, 2012, to resolve any remaining issues. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/26/11. (kpr)
March 20, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/20/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fitzhugh v. Fitzhugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fitzhugh
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B Fitzhugh, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]