McLane et al v. Rich Transport Inc et al

Plaintiff: James W McLane and Monica McLane
Defendant: Rich Transport Inc, Salem Leasing Corporation, Salem Global Logistics Inc, AAA Cooper Transportation Inc, Jerry Smith and Florentino Campos
Case Number: 2:2011cv00101
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 56 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and taking under advisement 76 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/9/12. (kpr)
September 6, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion in Limine, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/6/12. (kpr)
September 7, 2012 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 115 117 142 144 146 148 150 153 155 157 159 162 163 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/7/12. (kpr)
September 7, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Larry Cole filed by AAA Cooper Transportation Inc, Florentino Campos. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/7/12. (kpr)
September 20, 2012 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Don Elliot, Melody Piazza, John Trice, Jeff Fletcher, Christy Comstock, Jason Wales, and Louis Etoch, and their support staff, Frans Schimper, Diane DeVault, Sonja McCaleb and Kim Wilbert, to bring certain electronic devices into the courthouse in Helena, Arkansas, on Monday, September 24, 2012, through the duration of the trial, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/20/12. (kpr)
September 21, 2012 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing the case from the trial calendar for the week of September 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/21/12. (kpr)
January 5, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' joint request to dismiss this matter with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to term 205 Motion in Limine; 208 Motion in Limine; 211 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/5/13. (kpr)
March 19, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel and directing defts to produce records, as set forth in this Order within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLane et al v. Rich Transport Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W McLane
Represented By: Tara C. Couture
Represented By: Don R. Elliott, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica McLane
Represented By: Don R. Elliott, Jr.
Represented By: Tara C. Couture
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Transport Inc
Represented By: John Grant Trice
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Leasing Corporation
Represented By: John Grant Trice
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Global Logistics Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Represented By: John Grant Trice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Cooper Transportation Inc
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Represented By: John Grant Trice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florentino Campos
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]