Spencer v. Phillips et al

Defendant: S Phillips, Nwannem Obi-Okoye, T C Outlaw, Does and William Resto
Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00057
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 20 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Nwannem Obi-Okoye, T C Outlaw, Does, and Danial Newburn are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/23/12. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/12. (kpr)
September 5, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER directing the plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution pro se, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/5/12. (kpr)
April 5, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee oran ifp application and calculation sheet within 30 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an ifp application and calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/5/12. (kpr)
November 27, 2012 62 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 50 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Hearing, which the Court construes as Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Doc. Nos. 9 , 14 , 17 , 26 , are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/27/2012. (mcz)
November 28, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER directing the defendants to file responses to the 54 MOTION for Order and 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Addones Spencer within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/28/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER directing the plaintif to file, within 15 days of the entry of the Order, a response to defts' 45 MOTION to Dismiss and a separate statement of disputed facts that complies with federal and local rules and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/12. (kpr)
January 8, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 72 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 53 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; denying without prejudice pltf's 54 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/13. (vjt)
February 14, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 77 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 45 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; pltf's 67 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/14/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spencer v. Phillips et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nwannem Obi-Okoye
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Resto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]