Green v. Dawson et al

Defendant: Connie Dawson, Ester Petti, Todd Ball, Ming and Harder
Plaintiff: Maurice Green
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00050
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendant Shanta Hardy, and the United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 6) on Defendant at the address provided under seal without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/13. (kpr)
June 27, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of defendant Shanta Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/27/13. (kpr)
October 1, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 22 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, deft Shanta Hardy is DISMISSED from pltf's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/1/13. (vjt)
April 16, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within 15 days of the entry of the Order a Response to Defendant's 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and advising that the failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff and/or the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/16/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green v. Dawson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Dawson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ester Petti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]