Spencer v. Ward et al

Defendant: Blair Summers, J A Keller, C Samuels, S Lopez, W Annton, L Ward, John Fox and Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00063
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 22 Partial Report and Recommendations. The 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by C Farris, L Ward is granted and Spencer's claims against these defts are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/14. (kpr)
January 10, 2014 24 Featured Case RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION dismissing plaintiff's claims against Defendants Annton, Lopez, Samuels, Keller, Summers, Fox, Bureau of Prisons, FCI-Forrest City, Sheldon, Adduci, Cantrell, and Alsup without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/10/2014. (ks)
January 30, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER adopting 24 unopposed recommended disposition; dismissing without prejudice defendants Annton, Lopez, Samuels, Keller, Summers, Fox, the Bureau of Prisons, FCI-Forrest City, Sheldon, Adduci, Cantrell and Alsup. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2014. (mmd)
January 30, 2014 26 Featured Case JUDGMENT: Dismissing plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2014. (mmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spencer v. Ward et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Summers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Annton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Ward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]