Cobb v. Outlaw et al

Defendant: Ronald Smith, T C Outlaw and A Haynes
Plaintiff: Marvin Cobb
Case Number: 2:2013cv00115
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 13 . Plaintiff is advised that failing to timely and properly file, will result in this case being dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/05/20104. (kcs)
August 22, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss on the Fourteenth Amendment claim, denied without prejudice on the Eighth Amendment claim, and denied without prejudice on qualified immunity. Given the age, stage, and nature of the case, the September 30th deadline for a dispositive motion will not be extended without a very good reason. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2014. (jak)
November 6, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Cobb has advised the Court informally that he's in the hospital and can't meet today's deadline for responding to the motion for summary judgment. It will be fine if he submits his response tomorrow. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Outlaw et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Haynes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Cobb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]