Tedder v. American Railcar Industries Inc

Plaintiff: George Tedder
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00186
Filed: September 2, 2009
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 134 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to plaintiffs 133 notice of satisfaction of judgment, the supersedeas bond obtained by defendant American Railcar Industries, Inc. is hereby released and the clerk of court is directed to refund to American Railcar Industries, Inc., the funds on deposit in the amount of $1,555,045. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/4/2014. (ks)
March 7, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER, by agreement of the parties, Discovery deadline is extended up to & including 5/13/2011. All other deadlines remain the same. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2011. (jct)
May 31, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 20 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witness Designations; granting 34 Amended MOTION to Continue filed by George Tedder. A new scheduling order will be issued. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/31/2011. (jct)
March 23, 2012 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to allow use of deposition designations. Accordingly, Tedder's 53 Motion to allow use of deposition designations is also denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/23/2012. (jct)
April 5, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER authorizing Stephen Strauss, Stefani Rothermel & Robert Thompson to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Federal Courthouse in Jonesboro beginning Monday, April 9, 2012, and each day thereafter until the trial is completed in this case, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/5/2012. (jct)
April 6, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 51 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 52 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 56 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; holding in abeyance 77 Defendant's Motion in Limine; granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/6/2012. (jct)
May 14, 2012 98 Featured Case ORDER denying American Railcar Industries, Inc's oral motion to set aside 96 Jury Verdict & for remittitur. An appropriate Judgment shall accompany this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/14/2012. (jct)
May 14, 2012 99 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of George Tedder against American Railcar Industries, Inc., pursuant to 96 Jury Verdict, for damages in the amount of Two Million, Two Hundred Eighty-Four Thousand, Eight Hundred Eighty-Eight Dollars & Twenty Cents ($2,284,888.20). Tedder shall have 14 days in which to file his motion for costs. American Railcar Industries, Inc. shall have 7 days to file its response. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/14/2012. (jct)
October 20, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Transfer Case to the Jonesboro Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tedder v. American Railcar Industries Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Tedder
Represented By: Jimmy R. Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
Represented By: Robert F. Thompson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]