King's Ranch of Jonesboro Incorporated v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of

Plaintiff: King's Ranch of Jonesboro Incorporated
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2010cv00096
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Jonesboro Arkansas, City of. Defendant must file its response to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment on or before 2/2/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/2011. (jct)
April 25, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 9 MOTON for Summary Judgment filed by King's Ranch of Jonesboro Incorporated; denying 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jonesboro Arkansas, City of. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2011. (jct)
April 25, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE DECREE, pursuant to 32 Opinion & Order entered this date, the Court finds the City of Jonesboro violated the Fair Housing Act when it refused to make reasonable accommodations in its zoning policies when such acco mmodations were necessary to afford the handicapped individuals who will live at King's Ranch an equal opportunity to use & enjoy the home. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED that the City of Jonesboro must provide reasonable accommoda tion to King's Ranch: 1. by granting King's Ranch's request to waive the definition of "family" in Title 14 of the City of Jonesboro Zoning Resolution as it applies to King's Ranch; & 2. by authorizing King's Ranch to house up to 8 unrelated children & 2 house parents in its home located at 2816 Day Drive, Jonesboro, Arkansas, in Jonesboro's R-1 residential zoning district. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2011. (jct)
May 19, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Bench Trial on damages before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes for 7/22/2011 at 9:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/2011. (jct)
June 30, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 42 Joint Stipulation of the parties, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King's Ranch of Jonesboro Incorporated v. Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King's Ranch of Jonesboro Incorporated
Represented By: Larry L. Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]