Rivera v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Plaintiff: Karen Rivera
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00198
Filed: October 3, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendant's Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/22/2011. (jct)
March 21, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Request for Oral Argument filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. The Court will set a date for oral argument after a complete review of all the papers. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/21/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION that a national bank chartered by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency is authorized to do business within Arkansas. Therefore, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. was authorized to avail itself of the Arkansas Statutory Foreclosure Act. The Court will issue an appropriate Order in each of the five cases. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 37 Memorandum Opinion entered this date, granting 16 Motion to Dismiss filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. The complaint of Karen Rivera is dismissed without prejudice. If Rivera wishes to file an amended complaint, she sho uld do so w/i 30 days from the entry of this Order. If a motion for leave to amend is not filed, th Court will assume that Rivera has decided to stand on her pleadings & will enter final Judgment dismissing the complaint with prejudice, so that an appeal may be taken. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)
June 14, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant's reponse to 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint is extended up to & including 7/9/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/2012. (jct)
July 31, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 37 Memorandum and Opinion entered 5/11/2012, & 47 Order entered separately this date, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rivera v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rivera
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]