Hamlin v. Paschall Truck Lines Inc

Plaintiff: John Hamlin
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00245
Filed: October 25, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear as co-counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/16/2012. (jak)
November 16, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear as co-counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/16/2012. (jak)
February 1, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER finding that 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paschall Truck Lines Inc. should be converted to a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 12(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties shall have until March 1 , 2013 to submit supplemental material that is pertinent to the motion. If a party objects to the conversion, that party may file a response citing authority for the objection by February 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/1/2013. (jak)
April 16, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. This case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 04/16/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamlin v. Paschall Truck Lines Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hamlin
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paschall Truck Lines Inc
Represented By: John-Thomas Young
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: A. Jack Finklea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]