Riffey et al v. CRST Expedited Inc et al

Defendant: CRST Logistics Inc, CRST International Inc, CRST Expedited Inc, Mario Acevedo Becerra and John Does
Plaintiff: Beren Riffey and David Michael Riffey
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00294
Filed: December 6, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 119 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 and 114 Motions to Compel. Plaintiffs are ordered to produce the documents I reviewed in camera to Defendants by 5:00 p.m. Friday, December 12, 2013. Defendants' request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/12/2013. (jak)
December 20, 2013 125 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, which will be treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, all of Plaintiffs' punitive-damage claims and claims against International are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs' direct claims against Expedited are also DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/20/2013. (jak)
December 24, 2013 126 Featured Case JUDGMENT in accordance with 125 Order, Judgment is hereby entered in favor of CRST International Inc. All of Plaintiff's punitive-damages claims and claims against CRST International are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs' direct claims against CRST Expedited are also DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/23/2013. (jak)
January 14, 2014 132 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to a request from the plaintiff, counsel Melody Piazza and assistants, Sonja McCaleb, Chelsea Rice and Kelley Vasquez, and all lawyers and staff affiliated with this case are authorized to bring cell phones, laptop computers, digital cameras or personal digital assistants into the courthouse on February 11, 2014, and thereafter, subject to the rules contained in this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/14/2014. (jak)
January 16, 2014 133 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 Motion for Costs. Plaintiffs and Defendants will split the cost of the new FCE 50/50. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/16/2014. (rhm)
January 21, 2014 136 Featured Case LETTER/ORDER to counsel regarding the length of the trial for this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/21/2014. (jak)
February 3, 2014 194 Featured Case ORDER granting and denying Motions in Limine re 137 , 139 , 141 , 143 , 145 , 147 , 149 , 151 , 153 , 156 , 158 , 162 , 164 , and 166 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/3/2014. (jak)
July 15, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part and holding in abeyance in part 15 Motion to Compel and 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/15/2013. (jak)
July 15, 2013 28 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/15/2013. (jak)
August 20, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER overruling Defendants objection; Defendants are ordered to produce Mr. Becerra's personnel files to Plaintiffs within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/20/2013. (jak)
August 20, 2013 50 Featured Case LETTER/ORDER inviting Defendant's to respond to Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Reconsideration by 5:00 p.m. Friday, August 23, 2013, otherwise the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/20/2013. (jak)
September 3, 2013 55 Featured Case LETTER/ORDER inviting Plaintiff's counsel Ms. Piazza to advise whether Defendants' 51 Response indicates that the training DVD's at issue can be purchased. If this is true, it appears the 37 MOTION for Reconsideration is moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/3/2013. (jak)
September 12, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/12/2013. (jak)
September 13, 2013 68 Featured Case LETTER/ORDER inviting the parties to supplement their pleadings by 5:00 p.m. Friday, September 20, 2013 if they desire, before ruling on the Motion to be treated as one for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/13/2013. (jak)
September 17, 2013 71 Featured Case LETTER/ORDER directing Counsel Ms. Melody Piazza to file a reply to 69 Response to Motion filed by Mario Acevedo Becerra by noon Monday, September 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/17/2013. (jak)
October 15, 2013 96 Featured Case ORDER denying 91 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/15/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riffey et al v. CRST Expedited Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Logistics Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST International Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited Inc
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Acevedo Becerra
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beren Riffey
Represented By: Melody H. Piazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Riffey
Represented By: Melody H. Piazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]