Perez et al v. Family Dollar Services Inc et al

Defendant: Family Dollar Services Inc, Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc and Family Dollar Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Gaspar Perez and Perla Maria Franco Cadena
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00019
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER directing counsel to confer and inform the Court no later than Thursday, March 20, 2014, whether all parties want to proceed with the settlement conference scheduled for April 2, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 3/17/2014. (jak)
April 2, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the parties' Joint Request, the case is stayed until 28 July 2014. Stipulation of dismissal due by that date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/2/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER lifting the stay in this case and dismissing all of Perez's and Cadena's claims against all defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 88 Featured Case JUDGMENT re 87 Order, Perez and Cadena's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 89 Featured Case AMENDED JUDGMENT re 88 Judgment. The Court inadvertently omitted the intervenor's claims in its original Judgment. Perez's and Cadena's claims against Family Dollar Services Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Twin City Fire Insurance Company's complaint in intervention is dismissed with prejudice too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perez et al v. Family Dollar Services Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Services Inc
Represented By: Betty Ann Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Betty Ann Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores Inc
Represented By: Betty Ann Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaspar Perez
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Maria Franco Cadena
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]