Wells Fargo Bank NA v. Jonesboro Crossroads LLC

Counter_defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Counter_claimant: Bernard Court LLC and Jonesboro Crossroads LLC
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Defendant: Jonesboro Crossroads LLC and Bernard Court LLC
Receiver: Jerry Halsey, Jr
Case Number: 3:2013cv00033
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/19/2013. (jak)
March 14, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Since the Motion was filed before the settlement conference and since the case is so young, Plaintiff's Motion is denied as premature, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/14/2013. (jak)
November 15, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Joint Notice of Settlement and Request for Entry of Order. This case is dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. This Court specifically retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/15/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. Jonesboro Crossroads LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Glenn Edward Borkowski
Represented By: Roger Todd Wooten
Represented By: Glenn Edward Borkowski
Represented By: Lisa M. Peters
Represented By: Roger Todd Wooten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bernard Court LLC
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jonesboro Crossroads LLC
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Roger Todd Wooten
Represented By: Lisa M. Peters
Represented By: Glenn Edward Borkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Crossroads LLC
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Court LLC
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: Zachary Brian Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Jerry Halsey, Jr
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]