Page v. Arkansas State University System et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Page
Defendant: Arkansas State University System, Randy Martin and Lori Wynn
Case Number: 3:2013cv00077
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 4 Motion to Dismiss as moot. This Court declines to dismiss Mr. Page's claims against Mr. Martin and Ms. Winn in their official capacities as redundant to his claim s against ASU. This Court dismisses as a matter of law Mr. Page's employment discrimination claims purportedly brought under Title II of the ADA. This Court denies Mr. Martin and Ms. Winn's motion to dismiss Mr. Pages FMLA claims against them in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/14/2014. (jak)
August 4, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Regina Harrelson is no longer assigned as counsel of record for defendants. Ka Tina R. Hodge is substituted as defendants' counsel of record. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/4/2014. (jak)
October 27, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants' counsel to file plaintiff's medical records as an addendum under seal by Wednesday, October 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/27/2014. (jak)
October 28, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Compel ; denying without prejudice 31 Motion to Quash. Mr. Page may file a motion to reconsider this Court's ruling, supporting his claims with medical evidence, before the deposition date. Otherwise, the Court orders Mr. Page to appear at the deposition scheduled for Thursday, October 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/28/2014. (jak)
October 29, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the deposition of Mr. Page schedule for October 30, 2014, not proceed at the date and time currently set. The Court takes under advisement Mr. Page's motion to quash to the extent it seeks to quash any future deposition of Mr. Page, as well as his requests to extend the discovery deadline, set a new trial date, and issue a new scheduling order, until defendants have an opportunity to respond to Mr. Page's pending renewed motion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Arkansas State University System et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Page
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State University System
Represented By: Regina Haralson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Martin
Represented By: Regina Haralson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Wynn
Represented By: Regina Haralson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]