Edington v. Sammons et al

Defendant: Alexandra Jane Edington Sammons and Nathan Sammons
Plaintiff: Patricia Jane Edington
Case Number: 3:2013cv00202
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/13/2013. (jak)
June 27, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' 42 Motion to Amend Answer is denied. The Court intends to move the trial up a week to Tuesday, July 15, 2014. If either party objects, please submit objection by 5 p.m., Wednesday, July 2, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/2014. (jak)
July 8, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion in Limine; granting 45 , 46 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 50 , and 51 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/8/2014. (jak)
July 10, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER regarding the presumptive time limits for witnesses. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/10/2014. (jak)
July 18, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT awarding Plaintiff a life estate in the rent proceeds from the property transferred in the quitclaim deeds dated August 12, 2008. Plaintiff is also awarded damages of $12,480.00 for past rent proceeds from the life estate and $8,541.71 for the sale of property on her complaint against Defendant, Alexandra Jane Sammons. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/18/2014. (jak)
August 7, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, upon the posting of supersedeas bond in the amount of $21,021.71, the judgment is stayed pending the outcome of post-trial motions and any appeals. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/7/2014. (jak)
September 11, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law based on the findings of fact and conclusions of law stated within this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/2014. (jak)
September 25, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Attorney Fees. Based on the findings of fact and conclusions of law, Plaintiff is entitled to $25,000 in attorney's fees and $2,045.45 in costs from Defendant. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/25/2014. (jak)
September 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/13/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edington v. Sammons et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Jane Edington Sammons
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Sammons
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jane Edington
Represented By: Marc I. Baretz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]