Hohler v. Allied Mfg Co Inc, et al

Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc, Garlock Inc, Keene Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Allied Manfacturing Company Inc, Asbestos Corporation Ltd and Pittsburgh-Corning Corporation
Plaintiff: James Hohler
 
Case Number: 4:1991cv00460
Filed: July 24, 1991
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: District Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 (Notice) Motion to Dismiss filed by James Hohler; case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Eduardo C. Robreno.(mkf)
April 13, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case without prejudice pursuant to FRcvP 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno. (mkf)
April 29, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 as Amended effective 3/16/2009 re: modifications to procedures for processing cases, dockets, pleadings and orders in MDL 875 cases. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/16/2009.(bkp)
April 29, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 12 re: filing requirements and procedures. Signed by Judge James T. Giles on 5/31/2007.(bkp)
April 29, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER NO. 387. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/13/2009.(bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hohler v. Allied Mfg Co Inc, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Inc
Represented By: Tom F. Lovett (DECEASED)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keene Corporation
Represented By: John D. Cosmich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Overton S. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Manfacturing Company Inc
Represented By: Frederick S. Ursery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Ltd
Represented By: William L. Owen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh-Corning Corporation
Represented By: Ivan A. Gustafson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hohler
Represented By: Edward O. Moody
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]