Windstream Corporation et al v. Da Gragnano et al

Defendant: Tyrone M Kimrey, Dan Weinheimer, Craig Wallace, Johnny Lee, Helen E Franks, Homer A Meekins, Helen M Hale, Danny Ammons, Thomas Weldon Case, Careatha A Adams, Floyd L Madison, Dorene R Fuller, Donald H Rempe, Carmen M Bryant, Sarah McMullen, Linda Sue Donahue, Donald F Antholz, Charles J Moore, Joseph P Wansolich, Thomas Farrell Watts and Jack R Elliot
Plaintiff: Windstream Corporation, Windstream Benefits Committee, Windstream Systems of the Midwest Inc and Valor Telecommunications of Texas LP
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00953
Filed: December 23, 2009
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 135 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/11/11. (vjt)
September 28, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER granting pltfs' 146 Motion for Approval; Richard S. Krumholz, Lindsy Nichole Alleman, Franki Coulter, and Troy A. Price are hereby authorized to bring electronic devices into the courthouse on 9/28/11, subject to the provisions of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/28/11. (vjt)
October 6, 2011 152 Featured Case ORDER granting 151 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Carmen M. Bryant; pltfs' claims against Carmen M. Bryant are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/6/11. (vjt)
February 6, 2012 165 Featured Case ORDER granting 164 Motion of Rachel L. Williams to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of pltfs Valor Telecommunications of Texas LP, Windstream Benefits Committee, and Windstream Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/6/12. (vjt)
March 14, 2012 167 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying CWA's 160 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/12. (vjt)
July 13, 2012 172 Featured Case ORDER granting 171 Emergency MOTION to Extend the July 12, 2012 Deadlines; Motions and Status Report due by 7/26/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/13/12. (vjt)
February 26, 2013 192 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting pltfs' 179 Motion for Default Judgment and 180 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/26/13. (vjt)
February 26, 2013 193 Featured Case DECLARATORY JUDGMENT pursuant to 192 Opinioin and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of pltfs against Charles J Moore, Donald F Antholz, Donald H Rempe, Dorene R Fuller, Homer A Meekins, Johnny Lee, Joseph P Wansolich, Thomas Farrell Watts, and Tyrone M Kimrey. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/26/13. (vjt)
March 24, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER granting pltfs' 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party defts Adams and Weinheimer from this action without prejudice; Careatha A Adams and Dan Weinheimer terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/24/10. (vjt)
April 21, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER granting pltfs' 34 MOTION to Dismiss Deft Helen M. Hale without prejudice; Helen M Hale terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/21/10. (vjt)
May 19, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for David Van Os to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft Johnny Lee. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/10. (vjt)
June 4, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER directing pro se deft Sarah McMullen to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP as well as the Local Rules of this Court; and directing the Clerk to serve deft McMullen a copy of this Order by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/10. (bkp)
June 4, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER directing pro se deft Thomas Weldon Case to be familiar and comply with the FRCP as well as the Local Rules of this Court, and directing the Clerk to serve this Order on deft Case by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/10. (bkp)
June 4, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER directing pro se deft Danny Ammons to be familiar and comply with the FRCP as well as the Local Rules of this Court; and directing the Clerk to serve this Order on deft Ammons by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/10. (bkp)
June 30, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Sarah McMullen without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/10. (vjt)
July 9, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 56 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing deft Danny Ammons without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Deft Thomas Case; Deft Thomas Case, and Deft Case's counterclaim against Pltfs are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/10. (vjt)
September 8, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER granting Deft Johnny Lee's 70 Motion for Matt Holder to Appear pro hac vice for purposes of this case only. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/8/10. (vjt)
September 28, 2010 73 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying Lee's 59 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/28/10. (vjt)
October 28, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing deft Linda Sue Donahue without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/10. (bkp)
January 19, 2011 96 Featured Case ORDER granting 95 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Craig Wallace; Craig Wallace terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/19/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Windstream Corporation et al v. Da Gragnano et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone M Kimrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Weinheimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen E Franks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer A Meekins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen M Hale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ammons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Weldon Case
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Careatha A Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd L Madison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorene R Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H Rempe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen M Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sue Donahue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F Antholz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P Wansolich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Farrell Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R Elliot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windstream Corporation
Represented By: Lindsy Nicole Alleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windstream Benefits Committee
Represented By: Lindsy Nicole Alleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windstream Systems of the Midwest Inc
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valor Telecommunications of Texas LP
Represented By: Lindsy Nicole Alleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]