Beech v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc et al

Plaintiff: Harvey Beech
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA and Shapiro & Kirsch LLP
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00547
Filed: June 7, 2010
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2012 100 Featured Case AGREED DECREE of Foreclosure granting Trustee in rem judgment against the Property in the amount of $238,310.85. This Decree fully and finally resolves all claims, defenses, and issues in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/24/12. (kpr)
September 27, 2012 103 Featured Case ORDER approving the 102 Marshal's Deed and Report of Sale. The Clerk is directed to certify this Order and the deed under seal of the Court so that the documents may be recorded. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/12. (kpr)
July 13, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER postponing a ruling on 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harvey Beech and granting defts. ten days in which to supplement the record about the citizenship ofall of Shapiro and Kirsch's members. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/10. (bkp)
May 27, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 58 Motion for Sanctions Beech must pay the reasonable expenses caused by his failure to appear at the May 19 2011 deposition, and Wells Fargo has until June 24, 2011 to certify the fees and expenses incurred. Discovery ddl is extended until June 15, 2011, and the dispositive motion ddl is extended until June 30 2011. Beech is directed to appear for a deposition by Wells Fargo on June 13, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/11. (kpr)
June 10, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER cancelling depositions scheduled for June 13th and 14th; Wells Fargo's 66 Emergency MOTION to Quash is denied as moot; the Court will hold a status conference with Beech and counsel for Wells Fargo on Wednesday, 15 June 2011 at 3:30 P.M.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/10/2011. (mkf)
June 20, 2011 81 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER as addressed at the 15 June 2011 status conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/2011. (mkf)
February 16, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER directing Wells Fargo to make personal service on Mr. and Mrs. Beech of this order and the status report and certify service by February 24, 2012. 96 . If the Beeches have not signed the decree by March 2, 2012, Wells Fargo should file a moti on to enforce the settlement agreement. The Court will hold a hearing on any motion to enforce on March 15, 2012 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse in Little Rock. Mr. and Mrs. Beech are to appear at the hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/16/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beech v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Beech
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Kirsch LLP
Represented By: John K. Helbling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]