USA v. Foster

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Betty J Foster
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00083
Filed: February 7, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 19 ORDER re Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/26/12. (vjt)
February 8, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION against deft Betty J. Foster, individually, and doing business as Fosters Income Tax Service. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/8/11. (vjt)
April 2, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file under seal the list of personal information attached to the Declaration submitted by Betty J. Foster; a copy of the list will be provided to Richard G. Rose. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/2/12. (vjt)
April 23, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER directing Betty J. Foster to appear and show cause as to why she should not be held in criminal contempt of court. The Court hereby gives notice to Betty J. Foster that a criminal contempt trial against her will begin at 9:30 a.m. on 4/ 16/2014, in Courtroom #4D of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse. Betty J. Foster, individually, and d/b/a Foster's Income Tax Service, must appear at that trial. The Court directs the United States Marshals Service to serve a c opy of this Order on Betty J. Foster, individually, and d/b/a Foster's Income Tax Service and when service has been accomplished, to file an affidavit of service stating the date, time, place, and manner in which Foster was served with this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard G. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty J Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]