One Bank & Trust NA v. Galea et al

Defendant: Fae A Galea, Anthony W Imbimbo and Carmelo Galea
Plaintiff: One Bank & Trust NA
Case Number: 4:2011cv00567
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants may file an amended counterclaim within two weeks of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/27/12. (kpr)
December 3, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. One Bank shall have judgment against The Carmelo Galea Family Insurance Trust on the note and against Carmelo Galea a/k/a Charles Galea on his guaranty. One Bank's motion for summary judgment as to Fae Galea is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/12. (kpr)
December 7, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of One Bank & Trust NA against Anthony W. Imbimbo re 65 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. One Bank & Trust, N.A. is granted in personam judgment against Anthony W. Inbimbo, Trustee of the Carmelo Galea Family Insurance Tr ust, and Carmelo Galea a/k/a/ Charles Galea, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,324,154.92. One Bank & Trust NA shall also be awarded its court costs, attorney's fees, and related nontaxable expenses in the amounts to be determined by this Court by further proceedings and a separate motion by plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/7/12. (kpr)
February 25, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Stay execution of the judgment pending appeal on condition that the defts post a supersedeas bond in the amount of the judgment within ten days of the date of this Order. Defts' request for a temporary stay is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/25/13. (kpr)
April 1, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Court Costs filed by One Bank & Trust NA. One Bank is directed to submit unredacted copies of its billing records within 10 days of the date of this Order. One Bank may seek an Order permitting it to file this information under seal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)
April 9, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing 68 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/9/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Bank & Trust NA v. Galea et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fae A Galea
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony W Imbimbo
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Galea
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Bank & Trust NA
Represented By: Frank Stewart Headlee
Represented By: Gregory M. Hopkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]