Bradbury v. USA

Plaintiff: Ralph Bradbury
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2011cv00810
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. In due course, the Court will enter Judgment for the United States for the unpaid tax withholdings, less credits, plus interest through 18 August 2014. When the case is ready for Judgment, the Court will need an updated chart about accrued interest from the United States. The rest of this case is first out for trial on December 15. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/22/2014. (jak)
November 14, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER congratulating the parties on their settlement and will enter Judgment in due course. The 15 December 2014 trial is cancelled. If Bradbury contests the United States' updated liability figure of $823,166.18, he should respond to the motion for judgment promptly. Bradbury's prior objections are deemed renewed, are overruled, and are preserved. Response due by 24 November 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2014. (jak)
August 22, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to Stay. Bradbury must file a substituted statement, which conforms to the Court's scheduling order 38 by August 28, 2013. Bradbury should supplement the record with a complete condensed transcript of any depositi on cited to be filed as an exhibit by August 30, 2013. The Court would appreciate receiving a complete paper courtesy copy of each party's summary judgment filings in chambers by 30 August 2013 and of all future filings as they are made. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion to Stay. The Court will lift the stay, and set new pre-trial deadlines, as soon as funding for the Department of Justice is restored. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/13. (kpr)
October 18, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2014 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.. The Court has eliminated trial briefs. Pretrial conference will be on January 16, 2014. Bradbury's response to the United States' motion in limine 70 due by November 8, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/13. (kpr)
November 20, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting and confirming the Joint 81 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by USA and Acklin. All claims by and against Acklin 32 34 are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/13. (kpr)
December 16, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending 79 the Second Amended Scheduling Order. The Court will complete its analysis about what issues, if any, need trying as soon as it can. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/13. (kpr)
March 24, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The United States' 49 Motion for Summary Judgment on its counterclaim and on Bradbury's complaint is mostly granted. It is denied without prejudice on the precise amount of the penalty. Bradbury's 52 Motion for Summary Judgm ent is denied. His claim for a refund and abatement of the penalty fails as a matter of law. The Court would appreciate a stipulation, or a renewed motion targeted solely at all the numbers by 25 April 2014. 70 Motion in Limine is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/24/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradbury v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Bradbury
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Erin Healy Gallagher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]