Bartlett et al v. Frontier Gas Services LLC et al

Defendant: Crestwood Arkansas Pipeline LLC, Kinder Morgan Treating LP, Chesapeake Energy Corporation and Frontier Gas Services LLC
Plaintiff: Becky James, Carol Wieland, Jim Jackson, Lanelle Jackson, George Bartlett, Larry Clemons, Kathlyn Clemons, James Contratto, Louise Contratto and Dennis James
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00910
Filed: December 23, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER staying the case until the issue of class certification in Ginardi has been decided; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss ; and directing the Clerk to administratively close this case. Plaintiffs may re-open their case by filing a motion to re-open after a ruling on class-certification in Ginardi. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/5/12. (kpr)
September 17, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Parties' Joint Motion and Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims of the Estate of James Contratto. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/17/2012. (dmn)
October 18, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bartlett et al v. Frontier Gas Services LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestwood Arkansas Pipeline LLC
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Treating LP
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Gas Services LLC
Represented By: Mark Banner
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky James
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Wieland
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Jackson
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanelle Jackson
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bartlett
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Clemons
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathlyn Clemons
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Contratto
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Contratto
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis James
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]