Monte Carlo Aviation Corporation v. Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation

Plaintiff: Monte Carlo Aviation Corporation
Defendant: Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00028
Filed: January 13, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 12 Motion for Philippe A. Zimmerman to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 13 Motion for Mark N. Parry to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 14 Motion for Christopher R. Gresh to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER denying deft's 7 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
September 12, 2012 35 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying deft's 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/12. (vjt)
February 3, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER granting deft's 2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation answer due 2/28/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/12. (vjt)
November 4, 2013 68 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/04/2013. (jak)
February 7, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 69 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monte Carlo Aviation Corporation v. Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Carlo Aviation Corporation
Represented By: Mark N. Parry
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Represented By: Philippe Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Brian A. Pipkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]