Wiley v. RockTenn CP LLC

Plaintiff: Ted Wiley
Defendant: RockTenn CP LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00226
Filed: April 16, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying RockTenn's 88 motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/30/2014. (rhm)
July 9, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/12. (kpr)
November 30, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying RockTenn's request that this Court impose Local Patent Rules on plaintiff. The Court will issue by separate order a Final Scheduling Order incorporating the ddls set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/30/12. (kpr)
August 7, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 48 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/7/13. (kpr)
August 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 MOTION to Seal exhibit to motion for 49 Protective Order . RockTenn may file the confidential spreadsheet under seal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/29/13. (kpr)
October 9, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants summary judgment to RockTenn on any claim that the One-Piece Bin or Sioux City Bin infringes the 833 patent. Mr. Wileys claims for infringement as to the One-Piece Bin and the Sioux City Bin are dismissed with prejudice. RockTenns motion for summary judgment is denied in all other respects. RockTenn's counterclaims remain pending. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/9/13. (kpr)
October 22, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 73 MOTION in Limine filed by RockTenn CP LLC, 75 Objection filed by RockTenn CP LLC. The Court will conduct a pretrial hearing to address these matters by telephone on Wednesday, October 23, 2013, beginning at 12:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/22/13. (kpr)
May 15, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for B. Scott Eidson 6 and Mark A. Thomas 7 to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wiley v. RockTenn CP LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Wiley
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RockTenn CP LLC
Represented By: B. Scott Eidson
Represented By: John R. Elrod
Represented By: Mark A. Thomas
Represented By: P. Joshua Wisley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]