Durr v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Otis Durr
Defendant: Shalon Davis, Elderly Housing Development & Operations Corporation and Jacksonville Gardens Inc
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00272
Filed: May 9, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/17/13. (kpr)
February 21, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Compel. The USPS is directed to comply with the subpoena duces tecum issued out of this Court dated 10/25/12. Defts are directed to file a substituted motion to compel production of documents that redacts Ms. Murrel& #039;s personal information within seven days of the date of this Order. After defts submit the substituted motion, the Clerk is directed to remove dkt. no. 15 from the public record and replace it with the substituted motion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/21/13. (kpr)
February 21, 2013 29 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/21/13. (kpr)
August 14, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the parties joint stipulation for dismissal 37 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/14/13. (kpr) Modified on 8/14/2013 (kpr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Durr v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Durr
Represented By: Bridgette M. Frazier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalon Davis
Represented By: Lee J. Muldrow
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Edward R. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elderly Housing Development & Operations Corporation
Represented By: Edward R. Armstrong
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Lee J. Muldrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Gardens Inc
Represented By: Edward R. Armstrong
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Lee J. Muldrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]