Carter v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Edward Carter
Case Number: 4:2012cv00605
Filed: September 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to file a full status report by 1/15/13. Phillip J. Miller is directed to register with CM/ECF for the Eastern District of Arkansas by 12/31/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/12. (kpr)
February 15, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a joint report about the draft by 2/28/13; denying all pending motions without prejudice; and outlining standard procedures for this Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/15/13. (kpr)
March 21, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Response (Non Motion) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. The proposed Final Scheduling Order will issue with the changes set forth in this Order. Plaintiff should respond to the pending motion to dismiss (de#37) as soon as practicable, and no later than April 5, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/212/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Jesse J. Graham, II
Represented By: Donald W. Fowler
Represented By: Ronald D. Harrison
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Katharine R. Latimer
Represented By: David R. Richman
Represented By: Ethan D. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Carter
Represented By: Russell Harrison Beatie, Jr.
Represented By: Philip Jeremy Miller
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]