PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc v. PPC Broadband Inc

Plaintiff: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc
Defendant: PPC Broadband Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00623
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/2014. (ks)
June 10, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant PPC Broadband Inc's 13 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and 29 Motion to transfer the action to the Northern District of New York. Plaintiff PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc's 28 Second Motion to Amend Co mplaint is granted; Plaintiff's 20 First Motion to Amend Complaint is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 31 Motion to enjoin PPC from proceeding with its action against PerfectVision in the Northern District of New York is denied. Motions terminated. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/10/2013. (mcz)
June 3, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in light of the opinion issued by the United States Supreme Court in Nautilus, Inc. v. Biosig Instruments, Inc., No. 13-369, the parties must file simultaneous supplemental briefs on June 24, 2014. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/3/2014. (jak)
July 3, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/3/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc v. PPC Broadband Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: John R. Horvack, Jr.
Represented By: David Louis Gershner
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPC Broadband Inc
Represented By: Douglas J. Nash
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]