Pruitt et al v. Southwestern Energy Company

Plaintiff: Allan Peterson, Tammy Peterson, Jeffrey Wyborny, Kimberly Wyborny, Clifford Pruitt, Loveta Pruitt, Virginia Mills and Molly O Stone
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00690
Filed: November 2, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 20 SEC's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted 21 days from the date of this Order to amend their Complaint. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/13/2013. (dmn)
May 13, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Southwestern Energy Company's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and to Stay all Discovery. This case is dismissed without prejudice. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/13/2013. (dmn)
May 14, 2013 45 Featured Case JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 44 Order entered this date, judgment is entered granting 37 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing Plaintiff's claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/14/2013. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pruitt et al v. Southwestern Energy Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Peterson
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Peterson
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wyborny
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wyborny
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Pruitt
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loveta Pruitt
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Mills
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly O Stone
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Kimberly Logue
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]