Williams v. Rhein Chemie Corporation

Defendant: Rhein Chemie Corporation
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Case Number: 4:2012cv00799
Filed: December 31, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)
January 3, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based upon counsels' written representations, this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of January 13, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/3/2014. (jak)
January 10, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Rhein Chemie Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhein Chemie Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Represented By: Angela Renee Echols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]