Hare v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Defendant: L'Oreal USA Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and L'Oreal USA Inc
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Hare
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00087
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal-ERISA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 12 Featured Case ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties directed to file administrative record within 45 days of this order; Plaintiff's motion for judgment and brief due 21 calendar days after stipulated record is filed; Defendant's response to motion and brief due 21 calendar days after Plaintiff's brief is filed.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/2013. (mkf)
April 18, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss Hare's breach-of-fiduciary-duty claim with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/13. (kpr)
October 8, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. The Court vacates Liberty Life's decision and remands the claim for further evaluation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/13. (kpr)
October 8, 2013 32 Featured Case JUDGMENT vacating the denial of benefits and remanding Hare's claim to Liberty Life for further evaluation. 31 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/13. (kpr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2013: # 1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
January 16, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall pay Hare and her lawyer the agreed-upon amount by February 14, 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/16/14. (kpr)
July 8, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER applauding the parties' efforts in regards to the settlement. If the parties need any further relief, they should first move to reopen. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hare v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Hare
Represented By: Leon Marks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]