Johnson v. Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Clinic et al

Defendant: Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Clinic and Valley Medical Hospital
Plaintiff: Nancy Johnson
Case Number: 4:2013cv00090
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Response filed by Nancy Johnson, which the Court construes as a motion for default judgment. The motion is referred to the Clerk for consideration. The motion should not be termed, even if a clerk's default is entered. The Court will consider the motion for default judgment and request for a hearing. Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Clinic is dismissed without prejudice for failure to perfect timely service of process. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/13. (kpr)
April 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nancy Johnson. The Court directs plaintiff to complete the ifp application and file with the court within 30 days after entry of this Order, or submit the $350 statutory fi ling fee. Ms. Johnson is also directed to provide the addresses for defts Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Cinic and Valley Medical Hospital within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/11/13. (kpr) Docket text modified on 4/11/2013 to correct typographical error. (kbc)
May 1, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. 8 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/1/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Clinic et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Medical Moorpark Lab Clinic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Medical Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]