Mountain Pure LLC et al v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: Mountain Pure LLC, Angela Smith, Gerald Miller, Court Stacks, Kimberly Harbeson, Scott Morgan, Tracy Bush, Quinton Riley, Kadeena Depriest and William Morris
Defendant: Cynthia M Roberts, Bobbi Spradlin and John Does
Case Number: 4:2013cv00119
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 9 Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/8/13. (kpr)
December 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Amend/Correct, and finding as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file separately plaintiffs' amended complaint, which is attached to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended complaint.Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/20/13. (kpr)
June 13, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/13/2014. (ks)
March 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 46 49 defendants' motions for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice all claims against John Does 1-20; dismissing with prejudice all other claims; and denying all other pending motions at moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/19/2015. (rhm)
March 19, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 64 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be dismissed. The Court dismisses without prejudice all claims against John Does 1-20 and dismisses with prejudice all other claims. All other pending motions are denied as moot. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/19/2015. (rhm)
August 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Pure LLC et al v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Pure LLC
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Smith
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Miller
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Court Stacks
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harbeson
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Morgan
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bush
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Riley
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadeena Depriest
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morris
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]