Global Risk Intermediary LLC v. Aetna Global Benefits Limited et al

Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life & Casualty Bermuda Ltd and Aetna Global Benefits Limited
Plaintiff: Global Risk Intermediary LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00133
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw. The 23 first motion to compel is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/6/2014. (ks)
March 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 18 motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2014. (ks)
April 10, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/10/2014. (thd)
June 27, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 37 unopposed motion filed by the plaintiff, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Global Risk Intermediary LLC v. Aetna Global Benefits Limited et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life & Casualty Bermuda Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Global Benefits Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Risk Intermediary LLC
Represented By: Christian Campbell Michaels
Represented By: S. Graham Catlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]