Horton v. Shinseki et al

Defendant: Deniese Evans, Eric K Shinseki and Michael R Winn
Plaintiff: Andrew L Horton
Case Number: 4:2013cv00147
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss defendants Michael Winn and Deniese Evans. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/09/2014. (rhm)
December 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Horton's race discrimination and retaliation claims are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Horton's sex discrimination and harassment claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2014. (rhm)
December 17, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 23 Opinion and Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/2014. (rhm)
October 17, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion to Dismiss and ordering that Mr. Horton has up to and including November 18, 2013, to complete service upon the United States. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order via certified mail to Mr. Horton at his address of record. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/17/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Shinseki et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deniese Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Winn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L Horton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]