Griffin v. Jones-Foster

Plaintiff: Tony Griffin , Sr
Defendant: Melanie D Jones-Foster
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00625
Filed: November 1, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS pltf's property allegation against deft is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted 6 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/12/13. (tjb)
January 7, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Reconsideration re 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. The Court again adopts the report and recommendation. Griffins claims relating to the money withdrawn from his ADC inmate account are dismissed. His claims relating to inadequate medical care are not dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/7/14. (kpr)
February 11, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion to Reassign Case. The case remains assigned to the undersigned judge for disposition of all dispositive matters and for hearing appeals from any pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/11/2014. (ks)
October 31, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to file the complaint and application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 31, 2013. (mll) [Transferred from arwd on 11/1/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Griffin v. Jones-Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Griffin , Sr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie D Jones-Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]