Microsoft Corporation v. Delta Computer Experts LLC et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Delta Computer Experts LLC and Lloyd A Franklin, II
Case Number: 5:2008cv00168
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Compel and directing defts to make their initial disclosures and provide complete and full answers and responses to plaintiff's discovery request within ten days from the date of this Order; and denying 16 Motion to Continue as moot. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/08. (bkp)
February 6, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking the defendants' 3 Answer and directing the Clerk to enter a default against the defendants. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/6/09. (bkp)
February 11, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees and ordering the defendants to pay plaintiff's fees in the amount of $1690. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/11/09. (bkp)
April 1, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/09. (bkp)
April 1, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Microsoft Corporation against Delta Computer Experts LLC, Lloyd A Franklin, II in the amount of $970,000 plus attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $8,822.41 28 . The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this judgment and the permanent injunction directly to the defts and defts' counsel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Delta Computer Experts LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Computer Experts LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd A Franklin, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]