Van Horn v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Yevonne Van Horn
Defendant: Mark Martin and Darrell S Hedden
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00074
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Amend/Correct complaint, as modified. Van Horn must file an amended complaint by August 30, 2013. She must revise her proposed amended complaint to conform to the rulings in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/13. (kpr)
March 28, 2014 23 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2014. (jak)
May 5, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Dismiss all the retaliation claims. The 14 Amended Complaint is adequate as a matter of pleading on causation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Van Horn v. Martin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yevonne Van Horn
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martin
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell S Hedden
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]