Ferguson v. Kelly et al

Defendant: Ojiugo Iko, Corizon Medical Services Inc, J Snyder, Connie Hubbard, Wendy Kelly, Jennifer McBride, Pharmacorr Pharmacy and AllCare Correctional Pharmacy
Plaintiff: Edward Ferguson
Case Number: 5:2013cv00088
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 81 84 the defendants' motions for summary judgment; dismissing, without prejudice, Ferguson's claims against defendants Kelley, McBride-Andrews, Hubbard, and Iko, based on failure to exhaust administrative remedies; and dismissing, with prejudice, Ferguson's claims against defendant Corizon. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/2015. (kdr)
April 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and approving 7 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; dismissing, without prejudice, defendants AllCare Correctional Pharmacy and Pharmacorr Pharmacy; and dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff Edward Ferguson's retaliation claim against defendant Ojiugo Iko. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/2013. (kdr)
May 8, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 the partial recommended disposition; and dismissing the Doe defendants and Genia Snyder-Walker, without prejudice, for lack of timely party identification and service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/8/2014. (kdr)
October 9, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety 74 partial recommended disposition; and denying 63 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/9/2014. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojiugo Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacorr Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllCare Correctional Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.