Wesbster Business Credit Corp v. Bradley Lumber Company et al

Plaintiff: Wesbster Business Credit Corp
Defendant: Bradley Lumber Company, Bradley Specialties, LLC, Bradley Specialties Division, Bradley Lumber Company Outlet Store, LLC and F. David Chambers
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv01083
Filed: October 17, 2008
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2010 108 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 23, 2010. (cap)
August 23, 2010 109 Featured Case JUDGMENT granting 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arkansas Economic Development Commission. Judgment in favor of Arkansas Economic Development Commission against Bradley Lumber Company. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 23, 2010. (cap)
October 1, 2010 201 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Sawmill Real Property Collateral Referenced in Count I of the Amended Complaint filed by Arkansas Development Finance Authority. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2010. (tg)
October 21, 2010 208 Featured Case JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 201 ; Granting 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Arkansas Development Finance Authority. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 21, 2010. (cnn)
November 29, 2011 252 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting in its entirety 233 Report and Recommendations, and granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Webster Business Credit Corp; declining to adopt 234 Report and Recommendations, and granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion to Dismiss (sua sponte converted to Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Webster Business Credit Corp. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 29, 2011. (cap)
December 18, 2008 26 Featured Case ORDER granting Preliminary Injunction and granting Order of Delivery, and approving appointment of a master; Plaintiff directed to file a bond in the amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 18, 2008. (cnn)
March 27, 2012 306 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Arkansas Development Finance Authority against Bradley Lumber Company in the amount of $649,000.00 See also Judgment in 11-1028. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 27, 2012. (cnn)
March 27, 2012 307 Featured Case ORDER granting 303 Motion for Settlement; Clerk is directed to disburse funds from the Registry of the Court pursuant to the Settlement Agreement 304 ; Case Dismissed. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 27, 2012. (cnn)
March 30, 2012 308 Featured Case ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS as reflected by previous orders of the Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 30, 2012. (cnn)
December 5, 2012 312 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 5, 2012. (lw)
October 15, 2013 329 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 328 ; denying 317 Motion to Set Aside Foreclosure Sale and Order Confirming Sale. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 15, 2013. (cnn)
March 16, 2009 41 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injuction against Bradley Brand Furniture, LLC. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 16, 2009. (cnn)
March 23, 2010 87 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 23, 2010. (cnn)
March 23, 2010 88 Featured Case JUDGMENT granting 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of ADFA; in favor of Arkansas Development Finance Authority against Bradley Lumber Company; as of December 4, 2008, Bradley Lumber owes the principal amount of $1,000,000.00, with accrue d interest in the amount of $26,909.36, for a total of $1,026,909.36 with interest continuing to accrue daily in the amount of $174.74 until paid in full, plus attorneys fees, costs and expenses incurredand to be incurred by ADFA. ADFA is directed to supply the Court with the Decree of Foreclosure. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 23, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wesbster Business Credit Corp v. Bradley Lumber Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesbster Business Credit Corp
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Lumber Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Specialties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Specialties Division
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Lumber Company Outlet Store, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. David Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]