Evans v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Debtor: Barbara V. Evans
Plaintiff: Barbara V. Evans
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., EMC Mortgage, Bank of America, N.A. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Trustee: Jack Gooding
Case Number: 1:2012cv01038
Filed: February 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference; granting 15 Motion for Order extending and setting filing deadlines; response to defendant's motion to dismiss is due on or before April 23, 2012, any reply isdue on or before May 11, 2012. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 18, 2012. (cnn)
February 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 3, 2014. (mll)
February 3, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 3, 2014. (mll)
October 21, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to previous orders of this court judgment entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendants in the amount of $25,400.00 in damages and $33,673.93 in attorney fees and costs; defendants have 30 days from entry of judgment to make payment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2014. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Barbara V. Evans
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara V. Evans
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Represented By: Katherine M. Hingtgen
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Represented By: Katherine M. Hingtgen
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Daniel S. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jack Gooding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]