Pyle v. Stone et al

Plaintiff: Ricci B. Pyle, Sr.
Defendant: Richard R. Stone and Russell B. Endean
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv02008
Filed: January 30, 2008
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2008 16 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Russell B. Endean. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 31, 20008. (lw)
November 21, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER: denying 13 Separate Defendant Russell R. Endean's Motion for Protective Order, and adopting Report and Recommendations re 16 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 21, 2008. (sh)
January 22, 2009 18 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Ricci B. Pyle, Sr against Richard R. Stone, Russell B. Endean as set forth. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 22, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pyle v. Stone et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricci B. Pyle, Sr.
Represented By: Gary N. Speed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard R. Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell B. Endean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]