ABF Freight System, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al

Plaintiff: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Teamsters National Freight Industry Negotiating Committee, Teamsters Local Union 373, Teamsters Local Union 878, YRC Inc., New Penn Motor Express, Inc., USF Holland, Inc. and Trucking Management, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02165
Filed: November 1, 2010
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 138 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on August 1, 2012. (lw)
August 1, 2012 139 Featured Case JUDGMENT that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on August 1, 2012. (lw)
December 2, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER, the Court finds no basis for delaying a hearing re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by YRC Inc., New Penn Motor Express, Inc., USF Holland, Inc. and will set a hearing date by separate order. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on December 2, 2010. (lw)
December 3, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CRITERIA REGARDING 12/16/10 HEARING. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on December 3, 2010. (lw)
December 14, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER regarding 12/16/10 Hearing. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on December 14, 2010. (lw)
December 20, 2010 84 Featured Case ORDER; for reasons stated, defendants' 51 Motion to Dismiss, 56 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and 25 Motion to Dismiss Case are GRANTED. Pursuant to the judgment entered together with this order, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on December 20, 2010. (lw)
December 20, 2010 85 Featured Case JUDGMENT; consistent with the Order 84 that was entered on this date, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on December 20, 2010. (lw)
August 15, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER granting 93 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan W. Wright on August 15, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ABF Freight System, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald T. Hathaway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters National Freight Industry Negotiating Committee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 373
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 878
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Holland, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucking Management, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]