Sabram Estates West, LLC v. U.S. Trustee

Appellant: Sabram Estates West, LLC
Appellee: Arvest Bank
Case Number: 2:2012cv02086
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, as set forth. ( Appellee Brief due by 7/2/2012.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 18, 2012. (lw)
July 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing John T. Lee, Chapter 11 Trustee. Signed by Ben Barry, United States Bankruptcy Judge on July 24, 2012. (Bankruptcy Court Case number 2:10-bk-74892, Doc #346) (jrs)
September 21, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER affirming the decision of the Bankruptcy Court and dismissing the Appeal. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 21, 2012. cc: Bankruptcy Clerk and Judge(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabram Estates West, LLC v. U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sabram Estates West, LLC
Represented By: Derrick Mark Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arvest Bank
Represented By: Craig A Campbell
Represented By: Jackie L. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ruston C. Welch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]