Turner v. Graphic Packaging International, Inc.

Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Byron W Turner
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02114
Filed: May 24, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER denying as Moot 10 Motion to Compel and granting 11 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to appropriately respond to Defendant's discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on January 18, 2013. Mr. Turner is also directed to cooperate with def ense counsel in setting a date for Mr. Turner's deposition. Plaintiff is further advised that failure to comply with this order could result in dismissal of his complaint. The Defendant's request that Plaintiff pay reasonable expenses is denied. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 3, 2013. (sh)
July 8, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 18 Motion to Compel. Refer to order for further directions from the court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 8, 2013. (jas)
July 22, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 22, 2013. (lw)
August 6, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 23 Motion to Compel. Graphic Packaging's request for fees is also denied, signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 6, 2013. (sh)
January 23, 2014 36 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Graphic Packaging International, Inc. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 23, 2014. (jas)
January 23, 2014 37 Featured Case JUDGMENT. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 23, 2014. ***Civil Case Terminated.(jas)
February 7, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendant Graphic Packaging International, Inc.'s Bill of Costs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 7, 2014. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turner v. Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron W Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]