Ridgeway v. Calfrac Well Services Corp

Defendant: Calfrac Well Services Corp
Plaintiff: Clifton Wayne Ridgeway
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02159
Filed: July 16, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 22, 2013. Motions terminated: 11 MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed) filed by Calfrac Well Services Corp. (jas)
May 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Compel and for Continuance. This matter remains set for Jury Trial on July 8, 2013. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 8, 2013. (jas)
May 20, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 20, 2013. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ridgeway v. Calfrac Well Services Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calfrac Well Services Corp
Represented By: Michael D Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Wayne Ridgeway
Represented By: M. Jered Medlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]